US SR76 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of March 21, 2017, as "National Rosie the Riveter Day". Supports the designation of March 21, 2017, as National Rosie the Riveter Day. Acknowledges the important role played by women during World War II.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of March 21, 2017, as "National Rosie the Riveter Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1542) |
Same As/Similar To
HR162 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR418 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1293; text: CR S1290)
SR418 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1293; text: CR S1290)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Labor and employment
Military history
U.S. history
Women's employment
Conflicts and wars
Labor and employment
Military history
U.S. history
Women's employment