US SR75 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution reaffirming the state of Arunachal Pradesh as Indian territory and condemning the People's Republic of China's provocations in South Asia.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the state of Arunachal Pradesh as Indian territory and condemning the People's Republic of China's provocations in South Asia.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S463-464) |
Same As/Similar To
HR540 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.