US SR75 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9111-9114; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9111-9113; text as passed Senate: CR S9113-9114)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9111-9114; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9111-9113; text as passed Senate: CR S9113-9114)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Calls on Iran to release the 7 imprisoned leaders, the 12 imprisoned educators, and all other prisoners held solely on account of their religion. Calls on the President and Secretary of State, in cooperation with responsible nations, to condemn Iran's continued violation of human rights and demand the release of prisoners held solely on account of their religion. Urges the President and Secretary to utilize all available authorities, including the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010, to impose sanctions on Iranian government officials and other individuals directly responsible for serious human rights abuses, including abuses against the Baha'i community of Iran.
Title
A resolution condemning the Government of Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9111-9114; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9111-9113; text as passed Senate: CR S9113-9114) |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1713-1714) |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent .