US SR721 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453; text: CR S7436-7437)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453; text: CR S7436-7437)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week beginning on October 21, 2018, as "National Chemistry Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning on October 21, 2018, as "National Chemistry Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453; text: CR S7436-7437) |
Same As/Similar To
SR301 (Related) 2017-10-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6773-6774; text as passed Senate: CR S6770)
HR1129 (Related) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HR1129 (Related) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Chemistry
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/721/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres721/BILLS-115sres721ats.pdf |