US SR656 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) designates July 2020 as National Blueberry Month; and (2) recognizes the contributions of blueberry growers in the United States and their families, and that purchasing blueberries grown in the United States supports farmers, jobs, and the economy of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and designating July 2020 as "National Blueberry Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR882 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR528 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1479)
SR528 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1479)
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Commemorative events and holidays
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fruit and vegetables
Commemorative events and holidays
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fruit and vegetables