US SR642 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6545-6546)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating the week of September 15 through September 22, 2018, as "National Estuaries Week". Designates the week of September 15-September 22, 2018, as National Estuaries Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating the week of September 15 through September 22, 2018, as "National Estuaries Week".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6545-6546)
2018-10-04SenateS.Amdt.4045 Amendment SA 4045 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-10-04SenateS.Amdt.4045 Amendment SA 4045 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S6545; text: CR S6545) To amend the preamble.
2018-10-04SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6545-6546)
2018-10-04SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-18SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6236)

Same As/Similar To

SR230 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback