US SR623 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3736-3737; text: CR S3736-3737)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3736-3737; text: CR S3736-3737)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution calling on the Secretary of State to designate the Russian Federation as a state sponsor of terrorism.
Title
A resolution calling on the Secretary of State to designate the Russian Federation as a state sponsor of terrorism.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3736-3737; text: CR S3736-3737) |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433. |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2382) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1113 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.