US SR608 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7-1)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5701; text: CR S5695)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5701; text: CR S5695)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating August 16, 2018, as "National Airborne Day". Designates August 16, 2018, as National Airborne Day.
Title
A resolution designating August 16, 2018, as "National Airborne Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5701; text: CR S5695) |
Same As/Similar To
SR233 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/26/2017 CR S4310)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Commemorative events and holidays
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/608/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres608/BILLS-115sres608ats.pdf |