US SR596 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the 29th anniversary of the Tribal Canoe Journey of the Tribal Nations of the Pacific Northwest and congratulating the Puyallup Tribe of Indians for hosting the 2018 Power Paddle to Puyallup. Recognizes the 29th anniversary of the Tribal Canoe Journey. Acknowledges that the Tribal Canoe Journey is a vital part of the fabric and culture of the Tribal Nations of the Pacific Northwest. Congratulates the Puyallup Tribe of Indians for hosting the 2018 Power Paddle to Puyallup.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 29th anniversary of the Tribal Canoe Journey of the Tribal Nations of the Pacific Northwest and congratulating the Puyallup Tribe of Indians for hosting the 2018 Power Paddle to Puyallup.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5428) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1037 (Same As) 2018-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.