US SR59 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S432; text: 02/13/2023 CR S355-361)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S432; text: 02/13/2023 CR S355-361)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2023, through September 30, 2023, October 1, 2023, through September 30, 2024, and October 1, 2024, through February 28, 2025.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2023, through September 30, 2023, October 1, 2023, through September 30, 2024, and October 1, 2024, through February 28, 2025.
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S432; text: 02/13/2023 CR S355-361) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Klobuchar. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
SR40 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S325)
SR41 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S325-326)
SR42 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S326)
SR43 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S326-327)
SR44 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S327-328)
SR47 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S328-329)
SR48 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S329)
SR51 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S330)
SR52 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S330-331)
SR55 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S353-354)
SR56 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S354)
SR33 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S268)
SR34 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S268)
SR37 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S270)
SR38 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S324)
SR39 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S324-325)
SR50 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S329-330)
SR41 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S325-326)
SR42 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S326)
SR43 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S326-327)
SR44 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S327-328)
SR47 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S328-329)
SR48 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S329)
SR51 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S330)
SR52 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S330-331)
SR55 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S353-354)
SR56 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S354)
SR33 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S268)
SR34 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S268)
SR37 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S270)
SR38 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S324)
SR39 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S324-325)
SR50 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S329-330)