US SR59 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1091-1092)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1091-1092)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the support for the designation of February 12, 2017, as "Darwin Day" and recognizing the importance of science in the betterment of humanity. Supports the designation of Darwin Day. Recognizes Charles Darwin as a worthy symbol on which to celebrate the achievements of reason, science, and the advancement of human knowledge.
Title
A resolution expressing the support for the designation of February 12, 2017, as "Darwin Day" and recognizing the importance of science in the betterment of humanity.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1091-1092) |
Same As/Similar To
HR44 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SR374 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S302)
SR374 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S302)
Subjects
Biological and life sciences
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Genetics
Science, technology, communications
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Genetics
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/59/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres59/BILLS-115sres59is.pdf |