US SR567 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text 05/07/2020 CR S2328-2329)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text 05/07/2020 CR S2328-2329)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends and thanks the Department of State career professionals, the Repatriation Task Force, and the employees at U.S. embassies and consulates worldwide for their work to address the challenges related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) and to facilitate the repatriation of U.S. citizens and lawful permanent residents.
Title
A resolution commending career professionals at the Department of State for their extensive efforts to repatriate United States citizens and legal permanent residents during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text 05/07/2020 CR S2328-2329) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 474. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2329) |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional tributes
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional tributes
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs