US SR562 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for designation of the week of October 9, 2016, through October 15, 2016, as "Earth Science Week". Supports the designation of the week of October 9-15, 2016, as Earth Science Week. Expresses strong support for the goals and ideals of Earth Science Week to increase understanding of and interest in the earth sciences at the local, state, national, and international levels. Recognizes the importance of education and public outreach efforts to ensure that the people of the United States gain a better understanding of and appreciation for the impact of the earth sciences on their daily lives. Encourages K-12 students to participate in local, state, and national events in connection with Earth Science Week and to get involved in the celebration by exploring artistic and academic applications of the earth sciences.
Title
A resolution expressing support for designation of the week of October 9, 2016, through October 15, 2016, as "Earth Science Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6197) |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5848-5849) |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Earth sciences
Elementary and secondary education
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Earth sciences
Elementary and secondary education
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications