US SR534 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4024; text as passed Senate: CR S4024; text of measure as introduced: CR S3985)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4024; text as passed Senate: CR S4024; text of measure as introduced: CR S3985)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 1, 2010, as Silver Star Service Banner Day.
Title
A resolution expressing support for designation of May 1, 2010, as "Silver Star Service Banner Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Bond [R-MO] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4024; text as passed Senate: CR S4024; text of measure as introduced: CR S3985) |
Same As/Similar To
HR855 (Related) 2010-04-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR320 (Related) 2009-10-22 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S10706)
SR320 (Related) 2009-10-22 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S10706)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-resolution/534/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sres534/BILLS-111sres534ats.pdf |