US SR513 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733; text: CR S2728-2729)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733; text: CR S2728-2729)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster-care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster-care system. Expresses support for the designation of National Foster Care Month and for the designation of May 31, 2018, as National Foster Parent Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster-care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster-care system.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733; text: CR S2728-2729) |
Same As/Similar To
HR314 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
SR156 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR914 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
SR156 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR914 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres513/BILLS-115sres513ats.pdf |