US SR511 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3016-3017; text: CR S3017)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3016-3017; text: CR S3017)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends the work of the Global Alliance for Vaccines and Immunization (GAVI) to expand access to vaccines and immunizations in developing countries, affirms U.S. support for GAVI, and encourages continued collaboration with GAVI to introduce and sustain the use of new and underused vaccines in immunization programs.
Title
A resolution supporting the role of the United States in helping save the lives of children and protecting the health of people in developing countries with vaccines and immunization through GAVI, the Vaccine Alliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3016-3017; text: CR S3017) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1227-1228) |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Immunology and vaccination
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
World health
Foreign aid and international relief
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Immunology and vaccination
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
World health