US SR475 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses profound sorrow and deep regret regarding the death of the Honorable James Abdnor, former member of the U.S. Senate and House of Representatives for South Dakota, on May 16, 2012. Declares that when the Senate adjourns on May 24, 2012, it stand adjourned as a further mark of respect to the memory of the former Member of Congress.
Title
A resolution relating to the death of the Honorable E. James Abdnor, former United States Senator and Congressman from the State of South Dakota.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3659; text as passed Senate: CR S3659; text of measure as introduced: CR S3640) |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/475/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres475/BILLS-112sres475ats.pdf |