US SR46 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on the Judiciary from March 1, 2013, through September 30, 2013.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on the Judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Leahy. Without written report. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S874) |
Same As/Similar To
SR92 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2457)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/46/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres46/BILLS-113sres46is.pdf |