US SR436 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2649-2650; text: CR S2649-2650)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2649-2650; text: CR S2649-2650)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of World Malaria Day. Supports the ideals of World Malaria Day. Recognizes the importance of reducing malaria to improve child and maternal health, especially in sub-Saharan Africa. Commends the progress made toward reducing global malaria prevalence and deaths, particularly through the efforts of the President's Malaria Initiative and the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria. Welcomes public-private partnerships to develop more effective and affordable tools for malaria diagnosis, treatment, and vaccination. Recognizes the goals to combat malaria in the Tom Lantos and Henry J. Hyde United States Global Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Reauthorization Act of 2008. Supports continued U.S. leadership in bilateral, multilateral, and private sector efforts to combat malaria and to work with developing countries to create long-term strategies to increase ownership over malaria programs. Encourages members of the international community to sustain and increase their support for efforts to combat malaria.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of World Malaria Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2649-2650; text: CR S2649-2650) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 451. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2393-2394) |
Same As/Similar To
SR165 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589; text as passed Senate: CR S2582-2583)
Subjects
Africa
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health