US SR397 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S697-698; text: CR S707)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S697-698; text: CR S707)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of February 5 through February 9, 2018, as "National School Counseling Week". Designates February 5-February 9, 2018, as National School Counseling Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 5 through February 9, 2018, as "National School Counseling Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S697-698; text: CR S707) |
Same As/Similar To
HR108 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR44 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR44 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/397/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres397/BILLS-115sres397ats.pdf |