US SR38 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811-812)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811-812)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates February 4-February 8, 2019, as National School Counseling Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 4 through 8, 2019, as "National School Counseling Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811-812) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR42 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR477 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S280)
HJR84 (Related) 2020-02-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E120)
SR477 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S282; text: CR S280)
HJR84 (Related) 2020-02-03 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E120)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/38/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres38/BILLS-116sres38ats.pdf |