US SR374 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13469; text as passed Senate: CR S13469)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13469; text as passed Senate: CR S13469)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes: (1) the cooperative efforts of hunters, sportsmen's associations, meat processors, hunger relief organizations, and state wildlife, health and food safety agencies to establish programs that provide game meat to feed the hungry across the United States; and (2) such programs' contributions to decreasing hunger.
Title
A resolution recognizing the cooperative efforts of hunters, sportsmen's associations, meat processors, hunger relief organizations, and State wildlife, health, and food safety agencies to establish programs that provide game meat to feed the hungry.
Sponsors
Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-18 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13469; text as passed Senate: CR S13469) | |
2009-12-16 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Lincoln without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-12-14 | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S13192) |
Same As/Similar To
HR270 (Related) 2009-07-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Congressional tributes
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
Outdoor recreation
Congressional tributes
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
Outdoor recreation