US SR35 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commemorating the 70th anniversary of the liberation of the Auschwitz extermination camp in Nazi-occupied Poland. Commemorates January 27, 2015, as the 70th anniversary of the liberation of the Auschwitz extermination camp by Allied Forces during World War II. Honors the legacy of the survivors of the Holocaust and of the Auschwitz extermination camp. Calls on the people of the United States to: (1) remember the 1.1 million innocent victims murdered at the Auschwitz extermination camp as part of the Holocaust; and (2) continue to work toward tolerance, peace, and justice and ending all genocide and persecution.
Title
A resolution commemorating the 70th anniversary of the liberation of the Auschwitz extermination camp in Nazi-occupied Poland.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the resolution. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S674; text as passed Senate: CR S674) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S425-426; text of measure as introduced: CR S425) |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Poland
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Poland
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity