US SR340 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4920-4922; text as passed Senate: CR S4921-4922; text as reported to Senate: CR S4920-4921)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4920-4922; text as passed Senate: CR S4921-4922; text as reported to Senate: CR S4920-4921)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the atrocities perpetrated by the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL) against religious and ethnic minorities in Iraq and Syria include war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide. Expresses the sense of the Senate that: the atrocities perpetrated by the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL) against Christians, Yezidis, Shi'a, and other religious and ethnic minorities in Iraq and Syria constitute war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide; all governments and international organizations should call ISIL atrocities war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide; U.N. member states should coordinate on measures to prevent further war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide by ISIL in Iraq and Syria, and to punish those responsible for these ongoing crimes, including by the collection of evidence and, if necessary, the establishment of appropriate tribunals; the Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan, the Lebanese Republic, the Republic of Turkey, and the Kurdistan Regional Government in Iraq are to be commended for, and supported in, their efforts to shelter those fleeing violence from ISIL and other combatants until they can safely return to their homes in Iraq and Syria; and the protracted Syrian civil war and the indiscriminate violence of the Assad regime have contributed to ISIL's growth.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the atrocities perpetrated by the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL) against religious and ethnic minorities in Iraq and Syria include war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4920-4922; text as passed Senate: CR S4921-4922; text as reported to Senate: CR S4920-4921) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 447. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8887-8888) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR75 (Related) 2016-03-15 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Gulf States
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Jordan
Lebanon
Middle East
Organized crime
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Terrorism
Turkey
United Nations
Violent crime
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Gulf States
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Jordan
Lebanon
Middle East
Organized crime
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Terrorism
Turkey
United Nations
Violent crime
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity