US SR313 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/17/2019 S5542)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/17/2019 S5542)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the week of September 22-September 28, 2019, as Gold Star Families Remembrance Week and recognizes the sacrifices made by veterans and by the families of Armed Forces members who made the ultimate sacrifice in order to defend freedom and protect the United States.
Title
A resolution designating the week of September 22 through September 28, 2019, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/17/2019 S5542) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5669) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR664 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: CR S4637)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition