US SR305 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2017 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States. Recognizes the celebration of Filipino American History Month in October 2017 as: (1) a testament to the advancement of Filipino Americans, and (2) a time to renew efforts toward the research and examination of history and culture so as to provide an opportunity for all people of the United States to learn more about Filipino Americans and to appreciate the historic contributions of Filipino Americans to the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2017 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-25 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819) |
Same As/Similar To
HR571 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR1124 (Related) 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR678 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6823-6824)
HR1124 (Related) 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR678 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6823-6824)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/305/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres305/BILLS-115sres305ats.pdf |