US SR300 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6787-6788; text as passed Senate: CR S6788; text of measure as introduced: CR S6769)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6787-6788; text as passed Senate: CR S6788; text of measure as introduced: CR S6769)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Red Ribbon Week, 2011. Encourages: (1) children and teens to live drug-free lives, and (2) people in the United States to promote drug-free communities and to participate in drug prevention activities.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of Red Ribbon Week, 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-19 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6787-6788; text as passed Senate: CR S6788; text of measure as introduced: CR S6769) |
Same As/Similar To
HR427 (Related) 2011-10-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR578 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6680-6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631)
HR795 (Related) 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR578 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6680-6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631)
HR795 (Related) 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/300/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres300/BILLS-112sres300ats.pdf |