US SR30 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S597)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S597)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry for the 115th Congress. Limits expenses of such committee to specified amounts from: (1) March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017, (2) October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018, and (3) October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S597) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Roberts. Without written report. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/30/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres30/BILLS-115sres30is.pdf |