US SR275 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3429-3431; text as passed Senate: CR S3430)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3429-3431; text as passed Senate: CR S3430)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of the Senate that the: (1) Minute Man National Historical Park in Massachusetts serves an essential role in preserving the sites and vistas in New England where the American Revolution began, and in educating the public about the historic events that led to the birth of the United States; (2) Park honors and commemorates the ideals of democracy, liberty, and freedom that are the foundation of the United States and sources of inspiration for people everywhere; and (3) creation of the Park 50 years ago represents a remarkable achievement that continues to benefit the people of the United States, preserves the proud legacy of the Revolution, and serves as an enduring resource for future generations.
Title
A resolution honoring the Minute Man National Historical Park on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Paul Kirk [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3429-3431; text as passed Senate: CR S3430) | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262. | |
2010-01-28 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-11-04 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-282. | |
2009-09-21 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9590) | |
2009-09-21 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9590) |
Same As/Similar To
HR599 (Related) 2009-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Historic sites and heritage areas
Massachusetts
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Historic sites and heritage areas
Massachusetts
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history