US SR264 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5866)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5866)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 2017 as "National Kinship Care Month". Designates September 2017 as National Kinship Care Month. Honors the commitment and dedication of kinship caregivers and advocates. Encourages Congress to implement policies to improve the lives of vulnerable children and families.
Title
A resolution designating September 2017 as "National Kinship Care Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5866) |
Same As/Similar To
HR531 (Related) 2017-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR637 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/18/2018 S6234-6235)
HR1093 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR637 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/18/2018 S6234-6235)
HR1093 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Family relationships
Family services
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Family relationships
Family services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres264/BILLS-115sres264is.pdf |