US SR236 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4433-4434)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4433-4434)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing July 28, 2017, as "World Hepatitis Day 2017". Recognizes July 28, 2017, as World Hepatitis Day 2017. Expresses support for broad access to hepatitis treatments and for raising awareness of the risks and consequences of undiagnosed hepatitis infections. Calls for a robust governmental and public health response to protect the health of the 5 million people in the United States and 400 million people worldwide who suffer from chronic viral hepatitis.
Title
A resolution recognizing July 28, 2017, as "World Hepatitis Day 2017".
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4433-4434) |
Same As/Similar To
HR32 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1038 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR1038 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
World health
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/236/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres236/BILLS-115sres236is.pdf |