US SR205 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3629; text as passed Senate: CR S3629; text of measure as introduced: CR S3620)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3629; text as passed Senate: CR S3629; text of measure as introduced: CR S3620)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates June 19-June 25, 2011, as Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Week. Recognizes the need for additional research to find treatments and a cure for such disease.
Title
A resolution designating the period beginning on June 19, 2011, and ending on June 25, 2011, as "Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Week", and raising awareness and understanding of polycystic kidney disease and the impact such disease has on patients.
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3629; text as passed Senate: CR S3629; text of measure as introduced: CR S3620) |
Same As/Similar To
SR495 (Related) 2012-06-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4250; text as passed Senate: CR S4250; text of measure as introduced: CR S4243)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres205/BILLS-112sres205ats.pdf |