US SR194 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 15, 2017, as "World Elder Abuse Awareness Day". Designates June 15, 2017, as World Elder Abuse Awareness Day.
Title
A resolution designating June 15, 2017, as "World Elder Abuse Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3557-3558) |
Same As/Similar To
SR549 (Related) 2018-06-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3955)
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations