US SR18 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution reaffirming the United States-Argentina partnership and recognizing Argentina's economic reforms. Declares that the Senate: upholds its commitment to the partnership between the United States and Argentina and reaffirms that Argentina is a major U.S. ally; encourages the Department of State to coordinate an interagency strategy to increase cooperation with the government of Argentina on areas of bilateral, regional, and global concern; commends President Mauricio Macri and his Administration for making far-reaching economic reforms; encourages efforts to promote inclusive economic growth and reduce inequality; encourages such government to continue to investigate and prosecute those responsible for the 1994 bombing of the Argentine-Israeli Mutual Association (AMIA) in Buenos Aires and the death of AMIA special prosecutor Alberto Nisman; expresses its desire that the growing partnership between the United States and Argentina will result in greater cooperation at multilateral institutions; and supports the continuing implementation of the United States Trade and Investment Framework Agreement with Argentina and Argentina's efforts toward greater integration with the global economy.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the United States-Argentina partnership and recognizing Argentina's economic reforms.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S404) |
Same As/Similar To
HR54 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Argentina
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Foreign loans and debt
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Latin America
Middle East
Terrorism
United Nations
Argentina
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Foreign loans and debt
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Latin America
Middle East
Terrorism
United Nations