US SR175 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2734; text as passed Senate: CR S2732)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2734; text as passed Senate: CR S2732)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States to building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States. Thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States to building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2734; text as passed Senate: CR S2732) |
Same As/Similar To
HR253 (Related) 2015-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR704 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR448 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2576-2577; text as passed Senate: CR S2564)
HR704 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR448 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2576-2577; text as passed Senate: CR S2564)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/175/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres175/BILLS-114sres175ats.pdf |