US SR152 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the importance of the U.S.-Korea alliance in promoting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region and calls for further strengthening ties between the countries.
Title
A resolution expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 366. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2333-2334) |
Same As/Similar To
HR301 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR809 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR809 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea