US SR147 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3583-3584)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3583-3584)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of May 2013 as National Foster Care Month. Recognizes National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges that children in the foster care system face. Encourages Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster care system.
Title
A resolution recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster care system.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3583-3584) |
Same As/Similar To
HR203 (Related) 2013-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR442 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2957)
SR456 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3308-3309; text as passed Senate: CR S3299-3300)
SR442 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2957)
SR456 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3308-3309; text as passed Senate: CR S3299-3300)
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/147/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres147/BILLS-113sres147ats.pdf |