US SR14 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 1. (text: CR S259-260)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 1. (text: CR S259-260)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns in the strongest possible terms the horrific attack that occurred at the "Congress on your Corner" event hosted by Representative Gabrielle Giffords in Tucson, Arizona, on January 8, 2011. Offers heartfelt condolences to the families, friends, and loved ones of those killed in that attack. Expresses hope for the rapid and complete recovery of those wounded in the shooting. Honors the memory of Christina-Taylor Green, Dorothy Morris, John Roll, Phyllis Schneck, Dorwan Stoddard, and Gabriel Matthew Zimmerman. Applauds the bravery and quick thinking exhibited by those who prevented the gunman from taking more lives and helped to save those who had been wounded. Recognizes the service of the first responders who raced to the scene and the health care professionals who tended to the victims once they reached the hospital and whose service and skill saved lives. Reaffirms the bedrock principle of American democracy and representative government, memorialized in the First Amendment and which Representative Giffords herself read in the Hall of the House of Representatives on January 6, 2011, of "the right of the people peaceably to assemble, and to petition the Government for a redress of grievances." Stands firm in the belief in a democracy in which all can participate and in which intimidation and threats of violence cannot silence the voices of any American. Honors the service and leadership of Representative Giffords, a distinguished Member of the House of Representatives, as she courageously fights to recover. States that when the Senate adjourns on this day, it does so out of respect to the victims of this attack.
Title
A resolution honoring the victims and heroes of the shooting on January 8, 2011 in Tucson, Arizona.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - On the Resolution S.Res. 14 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 1. (text: CR S259-260) |
2011-01-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S255-260) |
2011-01-25 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate and ordered held at desk. (text of measure as introduced: CR S241) |
Same As/Similar To
HR32 (Related) 2011-01-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Arizona
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First Amendment rights
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
House of Representatives
Judges
Members of Congress
Violent crime
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First Amendment rights
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
House of Representatives
Judges
Members of Congress
Violent crime