US SR120 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/17/2021 CR S1617-1618)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution reaffirms the U.S. commitment to promoting economic prosperity, security, and democratic governance throughout the Americas, and it calls on the President to lead a coordinated diplomatic effort to achieve specified goals while hosting the Ninth Summit of the Americas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the Ninth Summit of the Americas and reaffirming the commitment of the United States to a more prosperous, secure, and democratic Western Hemisphere.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/17/2021 CR S1617-1618)
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-03-17SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Cuba
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
El Salvador
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Guatemala
Honduras
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Organized crime
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Venezuela
Violent crime
Western Hemisphere

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback