US SR109 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 3/15/2021 CR S1527-1528)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 3/15/2021 CR S1527-1528)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 2021 as "National Native Plant Month".
Title
A resolution designating April 2021 as "National Native Plant Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 3/15/2021 CR S1527-1528) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1845) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR570 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1859-1860; text: CR S1871)