US SR104 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution to express the sense of the Senate regarding the success of Operation Streamline and the importance of prosecuting first time illegal border crossers. Expresses the sense of the Senate that: gains made in border security in the Border Patrol's Yuma Sector and positive trends in recidivism rates are of critical importance to those living and working in the border region and to the nation; refusing to prosecute first time illegal border crossers will jeopardize those gains and the executive branch should remove any policy or direction to cease prosecuting first time illegal border crossers under Operation Streamline; the border security steps that have led to some measure of improvement on the border, such as the historical implementation of Operation Streamline, should be preserved.
Title
A resolution to express the sense of the Senate regarding the success of Operation Streamline and the importance of prosecuting first time illegal border crossers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 114-279. Additional views filed. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1633) |
Same As/Similar To
HR281 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico