US SJR63 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities against Iran unless explicitly authorized by a congressional declaration of war or a specific authorization for use of military force.
Title
A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities against the Islamic Republic of Iran that have not been authorized by Congress.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1280 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1279 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR82 (Same As) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR68 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 84.
SJR69 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR68 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 84.
SJR69 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/63/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres63/BILLS-116sjres63is.pdf |