US SJR49 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-58. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution condemning the violence and domestic terrorist attack that took place during events between August 11 and August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia, recognizing the first responders who lost their lives while monitoring the events, offering deepest condolences to the families and friends of those individuals who were killed and deepest sympathies and support to those individuals who were injured by the violence, expressing support for the Charlottesville community, rejecting White nationalists, White supremacists, the Ku Klux Klan, neo-Nazis, and other hate groups, and urging the President and the President's Cabinet to use all available resources to address the threats posed by those groups. This joint resolution condemns the racist violence and domestic terror attack in Charlottesville, Virginia, and rejects white nationalism, white supremacy, and neo-Nazism sentiments as antithetical to U.S. values. Congress offers condolences to the families of those who died in Charlottesville and sympathy and support for those injured, and expresses support to the Charlottesville community. Congress urges the President and the Administration to speak out against hate groups and use all available resources to address the growing prevalence of domestic hate groups.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution condemning the violence and domestic terrorist attack that took place during events between August 11 and August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia, recognizing the first responders who lost their lives while monitoring the events, offering deepest condolences to the families and friends of those individuals who were killed and deepest sympathies and support to those individuals who were injured by the violence, expressing support for the Charlottesville community, rejecting White nationalists, White supremacists, the Ku Klux Klan, neo-Nazis, and other hate groups, and urging the President and the President's Cabinet to use all available resources to address the threats posed by those groups.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-58. (TXT | PDF)
2017-09-14HouseSigned by President.
2017-09-14HousePresented to President.
2017-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-09-12HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7288)
2017-09-12HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7287-7288)
2017-09-12HouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2017-09-12HouseHeld at the desk.
2017-09-12HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-09-12HouseReceived in the House.
2017-09-11SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5165; text: CR S5165)
2017-09-07SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 212.
2017-09-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5006)

Same As/Similar To

HJR117 (Same As) 2017-09-07 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback