US SJR45 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution condemning the deadly attack on May 26, 2017, in Portland, Oregon, expressing deepest condolences to the families and friends of the victims, and supporting efforts to overcome hatred, bigotry, and violence. This joint resolution condemns the attack in Portland, Oregon, on May 26, 2017. It offers condolences to the families and friends of the victims who were killed and expresses hope for the recovery of the individual who was injured.
Title
A joint resolution condemning the deadly attack on May 26, 2017, in Portland, Oregon, expressing deepest condolences to the families and friends of the victims, and supporting efforts to overcome hatred, bigotry, and violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3372-3373; text as passed Senate: CR S3372-3373) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR105 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SJR44 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR44 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.