US SJR44 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution prohibits the proposed retransfer of various defense articles from the United Arab Emirates to Jordan, as described in Executive Communication 1428 and published in the Congressional Record on June 3, 2019.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed retransfer of certain defense articles from the United Arab Emirates to the Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 179 (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 179. (text: CR S4144) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142-4143) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Jordan
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Trade restrictions
United Arab Emirates
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Jordan
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Trade restrictions
United Arab Emirates