US SJR2 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution expresses disapproval of the Office of Foreign Assets Control's report to Congress that it intends to terminate sanctions imposed on En+ Group plc, UC Rusal plc, and JSC EuroSibEnergo, companies connected to sanctioned Russian oligarch Oleg Deripaska.
Title
A joint resolution disapproving the President's proposal to take an action relating to the application of certain sanctions with respect to the Russian Federation.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - Senate - Cloture on the measure RC# 6 (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 5 (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Motion to table the motion to proceed to the measure rejected in Senate RC# 4 (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 5 (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Motion to table the motion to proceed to the measure rejected in Senate RC# 4 (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 13. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Cloture on the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 42. Record Vote Number: 6. (CR S247) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S233-247) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Cloture motion on the measure presented in Senate. (CR S208) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S202-208) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 42. Record Vote Number: 5. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Motion to table the motion to proceed to the measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 42 - 57. Record Vote Number: 4. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S201) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 13. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged pursuant to section 216(c)(5)(B) of Public Law 115-44. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S27-28; text: CR S30) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR30 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 14 pursuant to section 216(c)(6)(B) of Public Law 115-44.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign and international corporations
International affairs
Russia
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign and international corporations
International affairs
Russia
Sanctions
Subversive activities