US SJR2 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment limiting Members of the House of Representatives to three terms and Members of the Senate to two terms.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR6 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR17 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR23 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SJR51 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR17 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR23 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SJR51 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/2/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sjres2/BILLS-115sjres2is.pdf |