US SCR7 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution condemning Russia's unjust and arbitrary detention of Russian opposition leader Vladimir Kara-Murza who has stood up in defense of democracy, the rule of law, and free and fair elections in Russia.
Title
A concurrent resolution condemning Russia's unjust and arbitrary detention of Russian opposition leader Vladimir Kara-Murza who has stood up in defense of democracy, the rule of law, and free and fair elections in Russia.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-11-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1359 Amendment SA 1359 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S5333) In the nature of a substitute. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1360 Amendment SA 1360 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1360 Amendment SA 1360 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S5333) To amend the preamble. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1359 Amendment SA 1359 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S939) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR27 (Same As) 2024-06-12 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.