US SCR47 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make a correction in the enrollment of H.B. 6157. Directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the enrollment of H.B. 6157 (Department of Defense and Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education Appropriations Act, 2019 and Continuing Appropriations Act, 2019) to: (1) amend the title, and (2) make a technical correction to division C (Continuing Appropriations Act, 2019).
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make a correction in the enrollment of H.B. 6157.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9059-9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9059-9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Frelinghuysen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-09-24 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-09-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-09-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6254; text: CR S6236) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6157 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-245.