US SCR46 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust victims live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years, and urging the Federal Republic of Germany to continue to reaffirm its commitment to comprehensively address the unique health and welfare needs of vulnerable Holocaust victims, including home care and other medically prescribed needs. Acknowledges the financial and moral commitment of the Federal Republic of Germany over the past seven decades to provide a measure of justice for Holocaust victims. Expresses support for the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust victims are able to live with dignity, comfort, and security.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust victims live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years, and urging the Federal Republic of Germany to continue to reaffirm its commitment to comprehensively address the unique health and welfare needs of vulnerable Holocaust victims, including home care and other medically prescribed needs.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5263) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 46. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5263-5266) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5187) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 568. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5009-5010) |
Subjects
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Germany
Government liability
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
International affairs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Mental health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Germany
Government liability
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
International affairs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Mental health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity